TN HB0054 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that each newly constructed or renovated public building owned, operated, or under the control of a public entity be equipped with a baby diaper changing station. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12, Chapter 2; Title 13 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that each newly constructed or renovated public building owned, operated, or under the control of a public entity be equipped with a baby diaper changing station. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12, Chapter 2; Title 13 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-01-19HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-18HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1008 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback