TN HB0076 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes military and memorial plates to be personalized; requires payment of a fee to defray the costs of designing and manufacturing the personalized plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes military and memorial plates to be personalized; requires payment of a fee to defray the costs of designing and manufacturing the personalized plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 461
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0235)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-10HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-10HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0099)
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1489 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 461

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback