TN HB0095 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each county to use precinct-based optical scanners for elections beginning no later than January 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 20, Part 1, relative to precinct-based optical scanners.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0218 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Sponsor(s) Added.