TN HB0108 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a county, municipal, or metropolitan government to seek an injunction against a person who harasses an employee of the county, municipal, or metropolitan government, or any agency thereof, if the harassment related to the person's status as an employee. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 49 and Title 50.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a county, municipal, or metropolitan government to seek an injunction against a person who harasses an employee of the county, municipal, or metropolitan government, or any agency thereof, if the harassment related to the person's status as an employee. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 49 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 331 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-29 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 97, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0108 |
2019-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/29/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0329) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/12/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0379 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 331