TN HB0111 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 463
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, declares the legislative intent that the dual enrollment grant be fully funded before any funds in the lottery for education account are transferred to the Tennessee Promise scholarship endowment fund. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, declares the legislative intent that the dual enrollment grant be fully funded before any funds in the lottery for education account are transferred to the Tennessee Promise scholarship endowment fund. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 463
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019; 07/01/2020
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-04-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0386)
2019-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0373)
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c House Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0319 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 463

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback