TN HB0113 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the statute of limitation for prosecution of second degree murder from 15 years from the offense to at any time after the offense is committed. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-210 and Title 40, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the statute of limitation for prosecution of second degree murder from 15 years from the offense to at any time after the offense is committed. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-210 and Title 40, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 410
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-08HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1, PNV 0
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction def. in Judiciary to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/13/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-28HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0593 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 410

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback