TN HB0129 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires custodians of state correctional facilities to provide feminine hygiene products, moisturizing soap that is not lye-based, toothbrushes and toothpaste, and any other healthcare product a custodian deems appropriate to women prisoners at no charge and in an appropriate quantity. - Amends TCA Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires custodians of state correctional facilities to provide feminine hygiene products, moisturizing soap that is not lye-based, toothbrushes and toothpaste, and any other healthcare product a custodian deems appropriate to women prisoners at no charge and in an appropriate quantity. - Amends TCA Title 41.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 411
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/21/2019
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 1
2019-04-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0328)
2019-04-29SenateMotion to reconsider adopted. (Amendment 1 - SA0328)
2019-04-29SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0328)
2019-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-25SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-24HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 2, PNV 3
2019-04-24HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0311)
2019-04-24HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0469)
2019-04-18HouseReset on cal. for 4/24/2019
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-12HouseTaken off notice for cal. in State Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-05HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2019-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0075 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 411

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback