TN HB0164 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a person from physically holding or supporting, with any part of the person's body, a wireless telecommunications device or stand-alone electronic device while operating a motor vehicle; imposes other similar restrictions on activities such as texting; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a person from physically holding or supporting, with any part of the person's body, a wireless telecommunications device or stand-alone electronic device while operating a motor vehicle; imposes other similar restrictions on activities such as texting; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 3 by Niceley (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY HOLT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 3 by Niceley (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY HOLT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 412 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 7, PNV 1 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0198) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA0199) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0184) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 53, Nays 38, PNV 4 |
2019-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0158) |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0173 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 412