TN HB0176 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands types of crop insurance offered under a limited lines producer license to include damage to crops caused by unfavorable weather conditions, fire or lightning, flood, insect infestation, disease, or other yield-reducing conditions or perils, in addition to present coverage for hail. - Amends TCA Title 43 and Title 56, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, expands types of crop insurance offered under a limited lines producer license to include damage to crops caused by unfavorable weather conditions, fire or lightning, flood, insect infestation, disease, or other yield-reducing conditions or perils, in addition to present coverage for hail. - Amends TCA Title 43 and Title 56, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 354 | |
2019-04-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Casualty Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0309 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 354