TN HB0182 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes references to the antique motor vehicle registration fee consistent. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, makes references to the antique motor vehicle registration fee consistent. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 254 | |
2019-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0045 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 254