TN HB0195 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the secretary of state to promulgate rules regarding registering a person to vote with the last four digits of a person's social security number instead of the complete number; defines "social security number" for purposes of elections, including voter registration and maintenance of voting records, as the last four digits of a person's nine-digit social security number. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires the secretary of state to promulgate rules regarding registering a person to vote with the last four digits of a person's social security number instead of the complete number; defines "social security number" for purposes of elections, including voter registration and maintenance of voting records, as the last four digits of a person's nine-digit social security number. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0074 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee