TN HB0207 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing the sale of surplus property by an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing the sale of surplus property by an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 20.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - HOUSE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 413
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/21/2019
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0383)
2019-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-25SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-24HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 1
2019-04-24HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0470)
2019-04-24HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0372)
2019-04-23HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2019
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0269 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback