TN HB0209 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes up to two members of an LLC that owns property in a city to vote in the city's elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 2, relative to voting rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0249 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee