TN HB0228 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, rewrites provisions governing limited pilot project for certification of a training program offered by an EMT/AEMT training center; creates limited pilot project for purpose of determining the impact of such training centers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, rewrites provisions governing limited pilot project for certification of a training program offered by an EMT/AEMT training center; creates limited pilot project for purpose of determining the impact of such training centers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 489 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 93, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/19 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0418) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0109) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0061) |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec for pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Re-ref. to Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Returned to Clerk's desk. |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0250 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489