TN HB0233 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor of possessing, owning, selling, transferring, or manufacturing cock fighting paraphernalia with the intent that the paraphernalia be used in promoting, facilitating, training for, or furthering cock fighting. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor of possessing, owning, selling, transferring, or manufacturing cock fighting paraphernalia with the intent that the paraphernalia be used in promoting, facilitating, training for, or furthering cock fighting. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Pub. Ch. 164 | |
2019-04-24 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-18 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-04 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 93, Nays 0 PNV 1 HB0233 |
2019-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/4/19 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 6 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0097) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 14, PNV 8 |
2019-02-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0222 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 164