TN HB0246 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires municipal legislative bodies to change the dates of municipal elections to coincide with the August primary and November general elections. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5 and Title 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 5 and Title 6, relative to local elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0190 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee