TN HB0257 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a Class D felony offense for entity or person who knowingly uses a communication or electronic device to obtain information concerning an elderly adult's medical condition or health, sends unsolicited or specifically refused medical supplies to the elderly adult, and files a claim or submits a bill with the state Medicare plan for reimbursement. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, creates a Class D felony offense for entity or person who knowingly uses a communication or electronic device to obtain information concerning an elderly adult's medical condition or health, sends unsolicited or specifically refused medical supplies to the elderly adult, and files a claim or submits a bill with the state Medicare plan for reimbursement. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 417 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 95, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/30/19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0400) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0265 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 417