TN HB0261 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the Right to Earn a Living Act, including requiring entry regulations, public service restrictions, and statutes to be demonstrably necessary and carefully tailored to fulfill a legitimate public health or safety objective, and allowing persons to petition applicable licensing authorities and bring civil actions when such standard is not met. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 4; Title 7; Title 38; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, makes various changes to the Right to Earn a Living Act, including requiring entry regulations, public service restrictions, and statutes to be demonstrably necessary and carefully tailored to fulfill a legitimate public health or safety objective, and allowing persons to petition applicable licensing authorities and bring civil actions when such standard is not met. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 4; Title 7; Title 38; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Commerce Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0196 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee