TN HB0263 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Meeting Adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Meeting Adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes weekend and federal holiday driving restriction for antique motor vehicles and allows them to be used for general transportation any day of the week; provided, that they are not driven more than 5,000 miles annually. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, removes weekend and federal holiday driving restriction for antique motor vehicles and allows them to be used for general transportation any day of the week; provided, that they are not driven more than 5,000 miles annually. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Meeting Adjourned |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0283 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee