TN HB0312 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires department of education to develop guidelines for LEA policies on concussions in sports and cheerleading activities; requires LEAs to develop policies and procedures regarding the identification and handling of concussions and head injuries that are consistent with the guidelines. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires department of education to develop guidelines for LEA policies on concussions in sports and cheerleading activities; requires LEAs to develop policies and procedures regarding the identification and handling of concussions and head injuries that are consistent with the guidelines. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 2/15/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/1/2012 | |
2011-04-27 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0589 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0312&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0312.pdf |