TN HB0312 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a qualified person to register and vote on election day; authorizes a person to update the person's voter information and vote on election day; requires the state election commission to promulgate rules for such purposes. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes a qualified person to register and vote on election day; authorizes a person to update the person's voter information and vote on election day; requires the state election commission to promulgate rules for such purposes. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0240 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback