TN HB0326 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing sales and use tax in regard to out-of-state dealers, - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing sales and use tax in regard to out-of-state dealers, - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 491
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 10/01/2019
2019-05-24 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-09HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-02SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-05-02SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0447)
2019-05-02SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-30HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0498)
2019-04-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0497)
2019-04-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0480)
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-17HouseReref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-03-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0325 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 491

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback