TN HB0350 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, provides that whenever Hardeman County acquires property at a tax sale, any non-governmental entity holding a vested and duly recorded contractual right to the payment of fees or assessments secured by such property retains such right; further provides that Hardeman County will be liable for the payment of such fees and assessments if the county makes actual use of the property purchased at the tax sale. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 67, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, provides that whenever Hardeman County acquires property at a tax sale, any non-governmental entity holding a vested and duly recorded contractual right to the payment of fees or assessments secured by such property retains such right; further provides that Hardeman County will be liable for the payment of such fees and assessments if the county makes actual use of the property purchased at the tax sale. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 67, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 419
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/21/2019
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0322)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0338)
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-02-19HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1263 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 419

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback