TN HB0353 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows certain persons who receive certified occupational training as a prisoner or a student in a high school technical training class to receive equivalent credit toward an occupational license relating to the training received. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 37; Title 38; Title 41; Title 49; Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, allows certain persons who receive certified occupational training as a prisoner or a student in a high school technical training class to receive equivalent credit toward an occupational license relating to the training received. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 37; Title 38; Title 41; Title 49; Title 62 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 492 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019; 01/01/2020 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 74, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Bowling, Reeves, Rose) |
2019-05-02 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. ( Daniel, Sanderson, Lafferty) |
2019-05-02 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence |
2019-05-02 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/2/19 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment 1 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 3 for 4/30/19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0355) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0152) |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0571 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 492