TN HB0422 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, restricts the use of the title "nurse" to those actively licensed or certified by the board of nursing; revises the provisions governing the board of nursing's enjoining violations of practicing nursing without a license. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, restricts the use of the title "nurse" to those actively licensed or certified by the board of nursing; revises the provisions governing the board of nursing's enjoining violations of practicing nursing without a license. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Pub. Ch. 245
2019-05-09 Effective date(s) 05/02/2019
2019-05-02 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-25HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-23HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-18HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-17SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-17SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0308)
2019-04-17SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-03-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-14HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 1, PNV 1
2019-03-14HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0034)
2019-03-07HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019
2019-03-05HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0743 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 245

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback