TN HB0497 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the definition of "eligible independent postsecondary institution" to include certain private postsecondary institutions for purposes of scholarships and grants funded from net proceeds of the state lottery. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, expands the definition of "eligible independent postsecondary institution" to include certain private postsecondary institutions for purposes of scholarships and grants funded from net proceeds of the state lottery. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Higher Education Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2019-04-09 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Def. to the Lottery Calendar in Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0441 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee