TN HB0513 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, vacates and reconstitutes the board of judicial conduct; rewrites other provisions governing the board. - Amends TCA Title 17, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, vacates and reconstitutes the board of judicial conduct; rewrites other provisions governing the board. - Amends TCA Title 17, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 496 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2019; 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 88, Nays 5 PNV 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/2/19 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. (Bell, Stevens, Gardenhire) |
2019-04-30 | House | Conf. comm. appointed (Curcio, Lamberth, Beck) |
2019-04-30 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/30/19 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment 1 |
2019-04-29 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1 HB0513 |
2019-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/29/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0342) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0335) |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0452 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 496