TN HB0524 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Regional Retail Tourism Development District Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 47; Title 48; Title 61 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Regional Retail Tourism Development District Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 47; Title 48; Title 61 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 498
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-05-24 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-09HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-02SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-05-02SenateS. Amendment #2 withdrawn.
2019-05-02SenateMotion to reconsider S. Am #2 adopted.
2019-05-02SenateTabling Motion Lifted.
2019-05-02HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 3 Ayes 76, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-05-02HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 2
2019-05-02SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-05-02SenateReset on next available calendar
2019-05-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0462)
2019-05-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0461)
2019-05-02SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0363)
2019-05-02SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-30HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0503)
2019-04-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0483)
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseRef. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1434 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback