TN HB0544 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the fiscal review committee to hear appeals from legislators related to fiscal notes produced by the committee; requires the committee to develop and adopt a formal appeal process. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2 and Title 3, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires the fiscal review committee to hear appeals from legislators related to fiscal notes produced by the committee; requires the committee to develop and adopt a formal appeal process. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2 and Title 3, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 9, PNV 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0041) |
2019-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1293 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee / no second