TN HB0623 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes police officers and firefighters who are members of the state retirement system eligible for service retirement upon completion of 25 years of creditable service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
As enacted, makes police officers and firefighters who are members of the state retirement system eligible for service retirement upon completion of 25 years of creditable service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362 | |
2019-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1237 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 362