TN HB0632 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, the state board of education to award a teacher five additional professional development points if the teacher's overall evaluation demonstrates an overall performance effectiveness level of "above expectations" or "significantly above expectations" and the evaluation is based on the teacher's performance while employed at a school that is on the priority list or the focus list. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, the state board of education to award a teacher five additional professional development points if the teacher's overall evaluation demonstrates an overall performance effectiveness level of "above expectations" or "significantly above expectations" and the evaluation is based on the teacher's performance while employed at a school that is on the priority list or the focus list. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. John Holsclaw [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 464 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 93, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/19 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment 1 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1 HB0632 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0374) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0322) |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0565 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 464