TN HB0635 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Def. to Summer Study in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Def. to Summer Study in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local governments to provide a secure electronic interactive system for invitations to bid, requests for proposals and other offers; exempts certain local governments. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires local governments to provide a secure electronic interactive system for invitations to bid, requests for proposals and other offers; exempts certain local governments. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Local Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action def. in Local Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0600 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee