TN HB0643 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-6)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Pub. Ch. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-6)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Pub. Ch. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of finance and administration, in consultation with the department of mental health and substance abuse services and the division of TennCare, to develop and administer a grant program to assist sheriffs who are required by law to transport persons who have been certified by a health care professional for transport to a hospital or treatment resource for a mental health examination to determine whether the person should be involuntarily admitted; authorizes hospitals and treatment resources to conduct a mental health examination to determine whether a person should be involuntarily admitted via telehealth services. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21; Title 8, Chapter 42; Title 9, Chapter 8; Title 13, Chapter 26; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 33, Chapter 2; Title 33, Chapter 6; Title 33, Chapter 7; Title 37, Chapter 1; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of finance and administration, in consultation with the department of mental health and substance abuse services and the division of TennCare, to develop and administer a grant program to assist sheriffs who are required by law to transport persons who have been certified by a health care professional for transport to a hospital or treatment resource for a mental health examination to determine whether the person should be involuntarily admitted; authorizes hospitals and treatment resources to conduct a mental health examination to determine whether a person should be involuntarily admitted via telehealth services. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21; Title 8, Chapter 42; Title 9, Chapter 8; Title 13, Chapter 26; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 33, Chapter 2; Title 33, Chapter 6; Title 33, Chapter 7; Title 37, Chapter 1; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Pub. Ch. 512 | |
2019-06-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-06-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0296) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0387) |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0579 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512