TN HB0674 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions related to stepparent visitation. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions related to stepparent visitation. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 431 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 6 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0409) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0261) |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0326 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 431