TN HB0735 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a person at least 16 years of age but not more than 18 years of age to be registered to vote upon turning 18 years of age through submittal of an application for a driver's permit, driver license, or photo identification license with the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, permits a person at least 16 years of age but not more than 18 years of age to be registered to vote upon turning 18 years of age through submittal of an application for a driver's permit, driver license, or photo identification license with the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0940 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee