TN HB0762 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits candidate who loses primary election from qualifying as a write-in candidate for the general election; prohibits write-in votes for such candidate from being counted for the general election. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 5 and Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, prohibits candidate who loses primary election from qualifying as a write-in candidate for the general election; prohibits write-in votes for such candidate from being counted for the general election. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 5 and Title 2, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 128 | |
2019-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1258 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 128