TN HB0768 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires county election commissions to conduct a supplemental registration at public and private high schools once each fall and spring semester; authorizes high schools to provide opportunities for students to register to vote online at times other than the supplemental registrations. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires county election commissions to conduct a supplemental registration at public and private high schools once each fall and spring semester; authorizes high schools to provide opportunities for students to register to vote online at times other than the supplemental registrations. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0503 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee