TN HB0771 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 888 of the Public Acts of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 888 of the Public Acts of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 434
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/22/2019; 06/30/2019
2019-05-22 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-15HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0302)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 1, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0427)
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-02HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0474 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 434

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback