TN HB0817 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the governor to appoint persons to fill positions on certain boards from lists of nominees submitted by interested groups, instead of requiring appointments to be made from such lists. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 63, Chapter 23, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the governor to appoint persons to fill positions on certain boards from lists of nominees submitted by interested groups, instead of requiring appointments to be made from such lists. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 63, Chapter 23, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211 | |
2017-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0240 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 211