TN HB0826 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the closure of all county and municipal school systems and special school districts on Veterans' Day. - Amends TCA Title 15 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the closure of all county and municipal school systems and special school districts on Veterans' Day. - Amends TCA Title 15 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration Subcommittee of Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee |
2019-02-18 | House | Reassigned to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1450 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee