TN HB0863 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Good Neighbor Compact." - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Good Neighbor Compact." - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0717 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee