TN HB0878 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an application for an absentee ballot to contain only the last four digits of the voter's social security number rather than the entire social security number of the voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires an application for an absentee ballot to contain only the last four digits of the voter's social security number rather than the entire social security number of the voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0735 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee