TN HB0899 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the exemption from sales tax on periodicals distributed twice monthly or on a biweekly or more frequent basis to periodicals distributed no less frequently than monthly. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, expands the exemption from sales tax on periodicals distributed twice monthly or on a biweekly or more frequent basis to periodicals distributed no less frequently than monthly. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 473 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/19 |
2019-04-01 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-01 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0925 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 473