TN HB0920 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to disclose on the department's website certain information related to state-funded travel for public employees to events at which state vendors or potential vendors are present. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 8; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to disclose on the department's website certain information related to state-funded travel for public employees to events at which state vendors or potential vendors are present. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 8; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0812 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee