TN HB0931 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, delays effective date of certain streamlined sales tax provisions until July 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Title
As enacted, delays effective date of certain streamlined sales tax provisions until July 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Pub. Ch. 157 | |
2019-04-24 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2019 | |
2019-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0787 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 157