TN HB0937 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-20)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-20)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases pay supplement from $600 to $800 for police officers and firefighters who complete 40 hours of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24, Part 2 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, increases pay supplement from $600 to $800 for police officers and firefighters who complete 40 hours of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24, Part 2 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 152 | |
2019-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0793 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 152