TN HB0965 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Failed in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes person who registers to vote by mail to cast the person's first vote by absentee ballot. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes person who registers to vote by mail to cast the person's first vote by absentee ballot. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseFailed in Local Committee
2019-04-04HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-04HouseRe-ref. Local Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1093 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback