TN HB0975 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 18 percent by volume to 24 percent by volume the alcohol content of wine that can be sold in grocery stores; changes the definition of wine for purposes of sales in grocery stores so that wine includes alcohol derived from wine that has added flavorings and additives. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, increases from 18 percent by volume to 24 percent by volume the alcohol content of wine that can be sold in grocery stores; changes the definition of wine for purposes of sales in grocery stores so that wine includes alcohol derived from wine that has added flavorings and additives. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0363 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee