TN HB0988 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to provide weekly mental health counseling to each child in a detention or shelter care facility; requires mental health providers to be licensed and consider the findings and recommendations of any validated risk and needs assessment or individualized case plan relevant to the child. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 37; Title 56; Title 63; Title 71 and Chapter 1052 of the Public Acts of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department to provide weekly mental health counseling to each child in a detention or shelter care facility; requires mental health providers to be licensed and consider the findings and recommendations of any validated risk and needs assessment or individualized case plan relevant to the child. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 37; Title 56; Title 63; Title 71 and Chapter 1052 of the Public Acts of 2018.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseDef. to Summer Study in Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseReassigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0949 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback