TN HB1021 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a local government from banning or regulating certain auxiliary containers; specifies that the state is the exclusive regulator of food and drink sellers, vendors, vending machine operators, food establishments, and food service establishments and prohibits local governments from taking certain actions in regard to such entities and activities. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 53; Title 62; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a local government from banning or regulating certain auxiliary containers; specifies that the state is the exclusive regulator of food and drink sellers, vendors, vending machine operators, food establishments, and food service establishments and prohibits local governments from taking certain actions in regard to such entities and activities. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 53; Title 62; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Pub. Ch. 158 | |
2019-04-24 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2019 | |
2019-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 7, PNV 1 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0153) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0127) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 21, PNV 2 |
2019-03-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0095) |
2019-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0138) |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-11 | House | Action def. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee to 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0431 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 158